Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970293

EP0970293 - CAMSHAFT FOR THE PERIODIC ACTUATION OF MOVABLY STORED ELEMENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KULUS, Conrad
Grood Leegde 14
D-26607 Aurich-Walle / DE
02 / BEIER, Alfred
Schluring 8
D-38108 Braunschweig / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98917023.819.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01624
Priority number, dateDE199711239125.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712391
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842952
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970293
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970293
Date:28.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/047
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:NOCKENWELLE ZUR PERIODISCHEN BETÄTIGUNG VON BEWEGLICH GELAGERTEN ELEMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN WELLE[2000/02]
English:CAMSHAFT FOR THE PERIODIC ACTUATION OF MOVABLY STORED ELEMENTS AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUCH SHAFT[2000/02]
French:ARBRE A CAMES POUR L'ACTIONNEMENT PERIODIQUE D'ELEMENTS MOBILES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL ARBRE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2001Fee for grant paid
10.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT28.11.2001
SE28.02.2002
GB19.03.2002
ES30.05.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2004/04]SE28.02.2002
GB19.03.2002
ES30.05.2002
Former [2003/17]SE28.02.2002
GB19.03.2002
Former [2002/27]SE28.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3616901  (MUSASHI SEIMITSU KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6 * page 10, lines 6-23 * * page 11, line 25 - page 13, line 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [YA]US4630498  (SANTI JOHN D [US]) [Y] 1-3,6 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 8 * * figure - * [A] 4
by applicantDE4423107
 EP0230731