Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968071

EP0968071 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PERMANENT WAY COMPONENT IN PARTICULAR A CROSS FROG STRUCTURAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BWG GmbH & Co. KG
Wetzlarer Strasse 101
35510 Butzbach / DE
For all designated states
VAE Aktiengesellschaft
Rotenturmstrasse 5-9
1010 Wien / AT
[2003/01]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
BWG GmbH & Co. KG
Wetzlarer Strasse 101
35510 Butzbach / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BWG Butzbacher Weichenbau Gesellschaft mbH & Co. KG
Wetzlarer Strasse 101
D-35510 Butzbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KUNITZ, Walter
Strasse des Friedens 13g
D-15745 Wildau / DE
02 / HÖHNE, Hubertus
Ebersgänser Weg 47
D-35510 Butzbach / DE
03 / RATZ, Gerhard
Mittelweg 13
D-35428 Langgöns / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert
Patentanwalt
Postfach 21 44
63411 Hanau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert
Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44
63411 Hanau / DE
Former [2000/01]Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt, Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b
63450 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date98917045.121.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01665
Priority number, dateDE199711202421.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712024
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842473
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968071
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968071
Date:19.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B23K25/00, B23K9/038, E01B7/12
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GLEISOBERBAUTEILS, INSBESONDERE HERZSTÜCKBAUGRUPPE[2000/01]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PERMANENT WAY COMPONENT IN PARTICULAR A CROSS FROG STRUCTURAL COMPONENT[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIECE DE SUPERSTRUCTURE DE VOIE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN ELEMENT DE COEUR DE CROISEMENT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1999National basic fee paid 
09.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
13.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2002Fee for grant paid
21.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB2099051  (BOWERS GEOFFREY) [X] 1 * page 2, line 18 - line 26 * * abstract * [A] 2-23;
 [A]DE930149  (GUSSSTAHLWERK BOCHUMER VER A G) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 33 - line 42 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4429207  (DEVLETIAN JACK H [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [A]US3671712  (FISHER SIDNEY L) [A] 18-23 * abstract *