Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973770

EP0973770 - FUNGICIDAL METHOXIMINOMETHYLDIOXAZINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEINEMANN, Ulrich
Am Sonnenhang 1
D-42799 Leichlingen / DE
02 / GAYER, Herbert
Sandstrasse 66
D-40789 Monheim / DE
03 / GERDES, Peter
Waldstrasse 75
D-52080 Aachen / DE
04 / KRÜGER, Bernd-Wieland
Am Vorend 52
D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
05 / MARKERT, Robert
Silesiusstrasse 82
D-51065 Köln / DE
06 / SEITZ, Thomas
Rietherbach 10b
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
07 / GALLENKAMP, Bernd
Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 13
D-42113 Wuppertal / DE
08 / STELZER, Uwe
Adolph-Kolping-Strasse 22a
D-51399 Burscheid / DE
09 / TIEMANN, Ralf
Ernst-Ludwig-Kirchner-Strasse 5
D-51375 Leverkusen / DE
10 / MAULER-MACHNIK, Astrid
Neuenkamper Weg 46a
D-42799 Leichlingen / DE
11 / DUTZMANN, Stefan
Weissenstein 95
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
12 / STENZEL, Klaus
Seesener Strasse 17
D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE
13 / HÄNSSLER, Gerd
Am Arenzberg 58a
D-51381 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98917046.923.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01667
Priority number, dateDE199711376203.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713762
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845289
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973770
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/12, A01N43/88
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:FUNGIZIDE METHOXIMINOMETHYLDIOXAZINE[2000/04]
English:FUNGICIDAL METHOXIMINOMETHYLDIOXAZINES[2000/04]
French:METHOXIMINOMETHYLDIOXAZINE FUNGICIDES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
31.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/08]
14.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DXY]WO9504728  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DXY] 1-10 * siehe das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seiten 53, 55, 56, 59, 65-81, 101, und ganz insbesondere Seite 100, Beispiel 218 *;
 [DY]WO9524396  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0468684  (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * siehe das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Seite 16, Formel I.5 *;
 [PXY]WO9727189  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [PXY] 1-10 * the whole document *