Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969995

EP0969995 - ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC UNIT FOR REGULATING PRESSURE IN BRAKE INSTALLATIONS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DINKEL, Dieter
Adolf-Guckes-Weg 2
D-65817 Eppstein / DE
02 / OTTO, Albrecht
Vilbeler Strasse 47a
D-61137 Schöneck / DE
03 / RISCH, Stephan
Bachgrund 3
D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE
04 / SONNENSCHEIN, Georg
Hauptstrasse 31
D-65760 Eschborn / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98917058.423.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01694
Priority number, dateDE199711221124.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712211
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842552
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969995
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969995
Date:22.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/36
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHES AGGREGAT ZUR DRUCKREGELUNG IN BREMSANLAGEN FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2000/02]
English:ELECTRO-HYDRAULIC UNIT FOR REGULATING PRESSURE IN BRAKE INSTALLATIONS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[2000/02]
French:ORGANE ELECTRO-HYDRAULIQUE POUR LA REGULATION DE LA PRESSION DANS LES EQUIPEMENTS DE FREINAGE DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
08.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2001Fee for grant paid
19.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33]
Request for further processing for:02.11.2000Request for further processing filed
02.11.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.12.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9408830  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED ;ZAVISKA DALIBOR (DE)) [A] 1,4 * page 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph L * * page 2, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE4406269  (NISSHIN SPINNING) [A] 1 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 35; figures 10-12 *;
 [A]WO9116220  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]  - JONNER W -D ET AL, "ANTIBLOCKIERSYSTEM UND ANTRIEBSSCHLUPFREGELUNG DER FUNFTEN GENERATION", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19931101), vol. 95, no. 11, pages 572 - 574, 579/580, XP000409587 [A] 1,5 * page 579, column L, paragraph 3 - column M, paragraph 3; figure 7 *