Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970295

EP0970295 - ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSP Innovative Automotive Systems GmbH
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LEIBER, Heinz, Karl
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 34
D-71739 Oberriexingen / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Lenzing, Andreas
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09
40103 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr.
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98917064.224.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01709
Priority number, dateDE199711205624.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712056
DE199711205524.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712055
DE199714157120.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19741571
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842957
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970295
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970295
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F01L9/04, H01F7/14
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ANTRIEB[2000/02]
English:ELECTROMAGNETIC DRIVE MECHANISM[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1999National basic fee paid 
31.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
30.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2000Fee for grant paid
21.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE20.09.2001
[2002/05]
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2334211  (SCHNEIDER CO OPTISCHE WERKE) [X] 1 * page 3, line 13 - line 20; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB2088137  (VEISZ GYOERGY, et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 57 - line 80; figure 3 *;
 [DA]DE3616540  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 37 - line 50; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB1471537  (VENARD R) [A] 1 * page 4, line 66 - line 79; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5161494  (BROWN JR JOHN N [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 39; figure 1 *;
 [PA]WO9717561  (AURA SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 7 * * page 7, line 19 - line 33 * * figure 1 *;
 [PA]DE19628860  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 42 * * column 4, line 6 - line 17 * * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0043426
 DE3616540