Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972221

EP0972221 - MATRIX SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT FÜR MIKROTECHNIK MAINZ GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 18-20
55129 Mainz-Hechtsheim / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / EHRFELD, Wolfgang
Kehlweg 22
D-55124 Mainz / DE
02 / LEHR, Heinz
Bülowstrasse 17
D-10783 Berlin / DE
03 / PICARD, Antoni
Eisenbahnstrasse 2
D-65347 Eltville / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/03]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98917095.627.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998EP01808
Priority number, dateDE199711363002.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713630
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844377
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972221
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972221
Date:21.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/03]
TitleGerman:MATRIXSCHALTER[2000/03]
English:MATRIX SWITCH[2000/03]
French:COMMUTATEUR MATRICIEL[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase28.08.1999National basic fee paid 
28.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
14.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2003Fee for grant paid
17.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.05.2003
GB21.05.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/22]GB21.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9110150  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,6,8 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 30; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4955686  (BUHRER CARL F [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 65; figures 1,2,5B *;
 [A]EP0567143  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 17; figures 1,2 *