Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974002 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974002



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 176
09.07.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.06.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.03.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
07.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
17.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
17.08.2001 Description Search / examination 4
17.08.2001 Description Search / examination 1
17.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 8
19.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
19.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
01.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 26
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 30
08.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
08.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28