blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974002


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
19.07.2002 (Expected) grant published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
07.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.04.2002 Renewal fee
13.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
13.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
16.11.2001 Change - German title published on  02.01.2002  [2002/01]
05.10.2001 Change - divisional application(s) published on  21.11.2001 [2001/47]
28.08.2001 Examination report or reply
11.05.2001 First examination report
04.05.2001 Examination report or reply
05.04.2001 Renewal fee
06.04.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
22.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication