blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974002 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP01122659 EP98917099



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4358309BGlobal Dossier 04.11.2009B2
JP2002508820 19.03.2002A
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1164268Global Dossier 24.05.2006B1
EP1164268 29.12.2004A3
EP1164268 19.12.2001A2
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
DE19714715 09.04.1997
EP98917099 30.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0974002Global Dossier 04.09.2002B1
EP0974002 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7042498 30.10.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19714715 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19736967 04.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59805418D 10.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
DE59805418 30.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59813561D 29.06.2006D1
Priority number Date
DE59813561 30.03.1998
DE19736967 25.08.1997
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100538914B 27.12.2005B1
KR20010006235 26.01.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6519930 18.02.2003B1
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
EP9801848 30.03.1998
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845586Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1095028C 27.11.2002C
CN1252120 03.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19736967 25.08.1997
DE19714715 09.04.1997
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1164268