Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974002

EP0974002 - PROCESS FOR MONITORING A NOx ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/04]PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A NOx ACCUMULATOR
[2002/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH
Hauptstrasse 150
53797 Lohmar / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / MAUS, Wolfgang
Gut Horst
D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / BRÜCK, Rolf
Fröbelstrasse 12
D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Kahlhöfer, Hermann , et al
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann
Rößler Heine PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle,Pagenberg,Dost,Altenburg, Geissler,Isenbruck Uerdinger Str. 5
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98917099.830.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01848
Priority number, dateDE199711471509.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714715
DE199713696725.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19736967
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845586
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974002
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974002
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F01N9/00, F01N3/08
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES NOx-SPEICHERS[2002/01]
English:PROCESS FOR MONITORING A NOx ACCUMULATOR[2002/01]
French:PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR DE NOx[2002/01]
Former [2000/04]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES NOx-SPEICHERS
Former [2000/04]PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING A NOx ACCUMULATOR
Former [2000/04]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN ACCUMULATEUR DE NOx
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
09.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2002Fee for grant paid
24.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01122659.4  / EP1164268
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0598916  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-11,13,17,23,24 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 44 * * column 8, line 32 - column 10, line 28 * * column 11, line 46 - column 12, line 34 * * column 14, line 7 - column 15, line 10; figures 1,7,12,13,15 * [A] 12,14,18;
 [XPA]DE19607151  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XP] 1-3,8-11,13,17 * column 1, line 64 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-4 * [A] 5,14,18,23,25;
 [A]US5402641  (KATOH KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8-11,13,16-18,23 * column 3, line 52 - column 8, line 53; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]DE19511548  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,9-11,17,18,23 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 *
by applicantEP0298240
 EP0628134
 WO9317228
 EP0485179
 EP0459396
 EP0286967
 WO9203643
 EP0545976
 WO9421902
 WO9114855
 EP0521052
 WO9203642
 EP0545974
 DE2643739