Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968259

EP0968259 - FUEL OIL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum Holdings BV
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUNDY, Michael, John
Pool Lane Ince
Chester Cheshire CH1 3SH / GB
02 / PEARSON, Michael
Pool Lane Ince
Chester Cheshire CH1 3SH / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Mansell, Keith Rodney , et al
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
P.O. Box 1
Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Mansell, Keith Rodney , et al
Infineum UK Ltd Law Department POB 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date98917104.620.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01895
Priority number, dateEP1997030193121.03.1997         Original published format: EP 97301931
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842808
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968259
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968259
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search reportEP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/22, C10L10/00, C10L1/14
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:BRENNÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/01]
English:FUEL OIL COMPOSITIONS[2000/01]
French:COMPOSTIONS FUEL-OIL[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
11.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2002Fee for grant paid
21.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.05.2003  10.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BP Oil International Ltd.
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London, EC2M 7 BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited
Patents and Agreements Division
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
 02  28.05.2003  11.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schweiger, Georg
Patentanwälte
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR)
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2003  10.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BP Oil International Ltd.
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London, EC2M 7 BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
 02  28.05.2003  11.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schweiger, Georg
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/31]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2003  10.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BP Oil International Ltd.
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London, EC2M 7 BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
 02  28.05.2003  11.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schweiger, Georg, Dr.
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/30]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2003  10.06.2003  ADMISSIBLE
BP Oil International Ltd.
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
London, EC2M 7 BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
04.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
23.10.2006Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/02]
Appeal following opposition23.02.2005Appeal received No.  T0192/05
26.04.2005Statement of grounds filed
23.10.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
10.02.2005Appeal received No.  T0192/05
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9623855  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 8, line 27 *;
 [Y]US3310492  (BENOIT JR GEORGE J) [Y] 1-10 * example 2 *;
 [DY]DE1232392  (CALIFORNIA RESEARCH CORP) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9420593  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9202601  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0634472  (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0569228  (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0482253  (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD [GB]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5478367  (SEXTON MICHAEL D [GB], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column W *;
 [DA]US4482356  (HANLON J VINCENT [US]) [DA] 1-10 * column W *