Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979565

EP0979565 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING PACKET SWITCHED DATA IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2010Change - representativepublished on 13.10.2010  [2010/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / RAITOLA, Mika
Nissnikuntie 7 B 5
FIN-02430 Masala / FI
02 / HÄKKINEN, Hannu
Taavinharju 18 A 2
FIN-02180 Espoo / FI
03 / SALONAHO, Oscar
Oksasenkatu 4
FIN-00100 Helsinki / FI
04 / RINNE, Mikko, J.
Tallbergin puistotie 1 C 25
FIN-00200 Helsinki / FI
05 / AHMAVAARA, Kalle
Ruostekuja 3 D 24
FIN-01610 Vantaa / FI
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/41]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2000/45]Slingsby, Philip Roy , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/07]Jeffery, Kendra Louise , et al
Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB
Application number, filing date98917163.227.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998FI00365
Priority number, dateFI1997000181028.04.1997         Original published format: FI 971810
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9849797
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979565
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04Q11/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PAKETVERMITTELTEN DATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2000/07]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING PACKET SWITCHED DATA IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2000/07]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES A COMMUTATION PAR PAQUET DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase29.11.1999National basic fee paid 
29.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
03.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/44]
06.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5168502  (MILLET GUY [FR]);
 [Y]EP0595637  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]);
 [XP]US5677918  (TRAN PHIEU MOC [US], et al);
 [A]US5487068  (SMOLINSKE JEFFREY C [US], et al);
 [A]WO9306671  (MOTOROLA INC [US])
 [A]  - NTT REVIEW, Volume 9, No. 3, May 1997, (Japan), HIDEO MATSUKI et al., "An Error Control Scheme for High-Quality, High-Speed PHS Data Communications", pages 83-93.,