Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001519029 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0974137 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2001 | B1 | EP0974137 | 26.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE209809T | 15.12.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2285682 | 06.01.2004 | C | CA2285682 | 15.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69802674T | 02.10.2002 | T2 | DE69802674D1 | 10.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1025174 | 03.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6381535 | 30.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | FR9800557 | 20.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9845823 | Global Dossier | 15.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2168750T | 16.06.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2761837 | 11.06.1999 | B1 | FR2761837 | 09.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9704259 | 08.04.1997 |