Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974137

EP0974137 - INTERACTIVE PROCESS FOR USE AS A NAVIGATIONAL AID AND DEVICE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.10.2010
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI, IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Webraska Mobile Technologies
L'Espace Cristal, Le Technoparc, 22, rue Gustave Eiffel
78306 Poissy Cedex / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Durocher, Jean-Michel
23, rue de Tourville
78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR
02 / Sommelet, Sophie
23, Rue de Tourville
78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Bloch, Gérard , et al
Gevers France
41, Avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Bloch, Gérard , et al
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2008/42]Bloch, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Bloch & Associés 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/36]Bloch, Gérard , et al
Bloch & Associés Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 2 Square de l'Avenue du Bois
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98917187.120.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FR00557
Priority number, dateFR1997000425908.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704259
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845823
Date:15.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974137
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974137
Date:28.11.2001
Language:FR
[2001/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/127
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR INTERAKTIVEN NAVIGATIONSHILFE UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU[2000/04]
English:INTERACTIVE PROCESS FOR USE AS A NAVIGATIONAL AID AND DEVICE FOR ITS IMPLEMENTATION[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE INTERACTIF D'AIDE A LA NAVIGATION ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
24.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2001Fee for grant paid
30.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  16.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
Gendron, Vincent Christian
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  WITHDRAWN
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
T-Mobile Traffic GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft mbB
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/02]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  16.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
Gendron, Vincent Christian
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  WITHDRAWN
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
T-Mobile Traffic GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Former [2006/44]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
Gendron, Vincent Christian
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  WITHDRAWN
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
T-Mobile Traffic GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Former [2006/32]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  WITHDRAWN
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
T-Mobile Traffic GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Former [2003/22]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
T-Mobile Traffic GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Former [2003/18]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
TEGARON Telematics GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen
Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE
Former [2002/43]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
 02  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Genimap Oy
PL 106
FI-01601 Vantaa / FI
Opponent's representative
Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
 03  28.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
TEGARON Telematics GmbH
Postfach 2549
53105 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Weiss, Klaus
DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP - C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/42]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.2002  26.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
OPTEWAY S.A.
2881 Route des Crêtes, BP 308
06906 Sophia Antipolis / FR
Opponent's representative
de Roquemaurel, Bruno
Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR
11.10.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.02.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.03.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
03.08.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/46]
Appeal following opposition14.05.2007Appeal received No.  T0816/07
11.07.2007Statement of grounds filed
03.08.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
03.08.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
DK28.02.2002
PT28.02.2002
LU20.03.2002
MC20.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
AT20.03.2008
FI20.03.2010
IT20.03.2010
[2011/26]
Former [2008/50]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
DK28.02.2002
PT28.02.2002
LU20.03.2002
MC20.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
AT20.03.2008
Former [2004/39]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
DK28.02.2002
PT28.02.2002
LU20.03.2002
MC20.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
Former [2003/48]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
DK28.02.2002
PT28.02.2002
MC20.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
Former [2003/46]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
DK28.02.2002
PT28.02.2002
MC20.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
Former [2003/31]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
PT28.02.2002
MC20.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
Former [2003/25]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
PT28.02.2002
MC20.03.2002
Former [2002/49]GR28.11.2001
IE28.11.2001
PT28.02.2002
Former [2002/48]IE28.11.2001
PT28.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5508917  (SIEGLE GERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 2-18;
 [YA]US5543789  (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-18;
 [YA]US5311434  (TAMAI HARUHISA [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-18;
 [A]US4954958  (SAVAGE CHARLES [US], et al);
 [A]DE19535576  (MANNESMANN AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0618531  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [PX]EP0803852  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *