blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971988 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971988



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 186
06.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 29
06.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 34
01.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.07.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
27.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.09.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 6
27.09.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
06.03.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
09.06.2000 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.10.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.10.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
26.10.2000 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.10.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.10.2000 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.10.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
08.12.2000 Description Search / examination 1
08.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
03.08.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
03.08.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.08.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.11.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.11.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
09.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
09.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
09.02.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.05.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1