blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971988


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.05.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
15.04.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
29.11.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
17.05.2002 (Expected) grant published on  03.07.2002  [2002/27]
30.04.2002 Renewal fee
01.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant
15.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
05.04.2001 Renewal fee
19.12.2000 Examination report or reply
23.10.2000 Examination report or reply
11.08.2000 First examination report
07.08.2000 Examination report or reply
16.06.2000 Change - designated states published on  02.08.2000 [2000/31]
09.06.2000 Loss of particular rights
06.04.2000 Renewal fee
01.03.2000 Loss of particular rights
14.12.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
03.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
03.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication