blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0971988
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0971988Global Dossier 03.07.2002B1
EP0971988 19.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9800569 20.03.1998
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT220088T 15.07.2002T
Priority number Date
FR9800569 20.03.1998
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7049898 30.10.1998A
Priority number Date
FR9800569 20.03.1998
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69806364T 06.03.2003T2
DE69806364D 08.08.2002D1
Priority number Date
FR9800569 20.03.1998
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6348536 19.02.2002B1
Priority number Date
FR9800569 20.03.1998
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845374Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2179482T 16.01.2003T3
Priority number Date
FR9704308 04.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2761692 11.08.2000B1
FR2761692 09.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704308 04.04.1997