blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0971988

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
 PTLapse: 03.10.2002
 SELapse: 03.10.2002
Examination procedure09.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.12.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted03.07.2002
Opposition procedure04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 25.06.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990927
 
Event date:02.08.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000810
 
Event date:03.07.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE
 
Event date:03.07.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:220088
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020715
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:08.08.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69806364
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020808
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:03.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021003
 
Event date:03.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021003
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20020912
 
Event date:16.01.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2179482 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030404
 
Event date:05.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R008 69806364 DE
Code Expl.: CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT
 
Event date:05.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R039 69806364 DE
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION ACTION FILED
 
Event date:12.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69806364 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE
 
Event date:28.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:27.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20170329
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170326
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20170303
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20170327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:26.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R040 69806364 DE
Code Expl.:+WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:26.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 69806364 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170324
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170329
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170328
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:20.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69806364 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:21.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180319
 
Event date:09.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180320
 
Event date:11.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20180319
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180319
 
Event date:15.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 220088 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20180320