Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971988

EP0971988 - LAMELLAR FILLER PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TALC DE LUZENAC
09250 Luzenac / FR
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / FOURTY, Georges
41, rue des Martyrs de la Libération
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
02 / JOUFFRET, Frédéric
36, avenue Aristide Briand
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
03 / MONNOT, Patrice
6, impasse du Ramier des Catalans
F-31000 Toulouse / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés
95, rue des Amidonniers
31000 Toulouse / FR
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date98917199.620.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998FR00569
Priority number, dateFR1997000430804.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704308
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845374
Date:15.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971988
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971988
Date:03.07.2002
Language:FR
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09C3/04, C09C1/28, C09C1/42, C09C1/40
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON LAMELLAREN FÜLLSTOFFEN FÜR POLYMERE[2000/03]
English:LAMELLAR FILLER PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF POLYMERS[2000/03]
French:TRAITEMENT DE CHARGES LAMELLAIRES POUR POLYMERES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
05.11.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.03.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC
10.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2002Fee for grant paid
09.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.12.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.12.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
[2003/22]
Former [2003/03]SE03.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS6272739  ;
 [X]WO9517998  (TALC DE LUZENAC [FR], et al) [X] 20-23 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 27 *;
 [XA]WO9712002  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 20 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph L - page 12, line 1; claims 1-7 * [A] 1-4,9,10;
 [X]WO9624639  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 20 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9702323  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1,18,20 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870829), vol. 11, no. 268, Database accession no. (C - 444), [X] 20,22 * abstract *