Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972102

EP0972102 - method for producing multiaxial fibrous webs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PRODUCING MULTIAXIAL FIBROUS WEBS
[2003/10]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Opposition rejectedpublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA"
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Hexcel Reinforcements
3, Avenue Condorcet
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Hexcel Reinforcements
3, Avenue Condorcet
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Hexcel Fabrics
3, Avenue Condorcet
69608 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
Former [2000/03]For:DE  ES  FR  GB  IT  NL  SE 
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For:DE  ES  FR  GB  IT  NL  BE 
Hexcel Fabrics
3, Avenue Condorcet
69608 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOMPARD, Bruno
23, rue Julie
F-69003 Lyon / FR
02 / OLRY, Pierre
27, rue Edmond Costedoat
F-33000 Bordeaux / FR
03 / DUVAL, Renaud
57, rue Aristide Briand
F-69270 Couzon au Mont d'Or / FR
04 / BRUYERE, Alain
9, impasse J. Sorlin
F-38090 Villefontaine / FR
05 / COUPE, Dominique
70, avenue de Paris, Parc Sainte Christine
F-33165 Le Haillan / FR
06 / AUCAGNE, Jean
Rochetoirin
F-38110 La Tour du Pin / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98917226.725.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998FR00597
Priority number, dateFR1997000383228.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9703832
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844183
Date:08.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972102
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972102
Date:12.11.2003
Language:FR
[2003/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:D04H13/00, D04H3/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von multiaxialen Vliesstoffen[2003/10]
English:method for producing multiaxial fibrous webs[2003/10]
French:Procédé pour la réalisation de nappes fibreuses multiaxiales[2003/10]
Former [2000/03]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MULTIAXIALEN VLIESSTOFFEN
Former [2000/03]METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PRODUCING MULTIAXIAL FIBROUS WEBS
Former [2000/03]PROCEDE ET MACHINE POUR LA REALISATION DE NAPPES FIBREUSES MULTIAXIALES
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
09.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2003Fee for grant paid
11.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.08.2004  17.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Liba Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Oberklingensporn 1
95119 Naila / DE
Opponent's representative
Leske, Thomas
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
 02  11.08.2004  14.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
SAERTEX GmbH & Co.KG:
Brochterbecker Damm 52
48 369 Saerbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Habbel, Hans-Georg
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/24]
Opponent(s)01  06.08.2004  17.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Liba Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Oberklingensporn 1
95119 Naila / DE
Opponent's representative
Leske, Thomas, Dr.
Frohwitter, Patent-u. Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81630 München / DE
 02  11.08.2004  14.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
SAERTEX GmbH & Co.KG:
Brochterbecker Damm 52
48 369 Saerbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Habbel, Hans-Georg
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
Former [2004/41]
Opponent(s)01  06.08.2004  17.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Liba Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Oberklingensporn 1
95119 Naila / DE
Opponent's representative
Leske, Thomas, Dr.
Frohwitter, Patent-u. Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81630 München / DE
 02  11.08.2004   
SAERTEX Wagener GmbH & Co. KG
Brochterbecker Damm 52
48369 Saerbeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
Former [2004/40]
Opponent(s)01  06.08.2004   
Liba Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Oberklingensporn 1
95119 Naila / DE
Opponent's representative
Leske, Thomas, Dr.
Frohwitter, Patent-u. Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81630 München / DE
17.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.01.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
30.12.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.12.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
06.03.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/28]
Appeal following opposition02.03.2006Appeal received No.  T0282/06
29.04.2006Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
06.03.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:29.04.2002Request for further processing filed
29.04.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US3250655  (SOLOMON ADLER) [A] 1-77 * figure - *;
 [A]US3566733  (MCCLEAN WILLIAM G) [A] 1-77 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4256522  (BRITTON ARTHUR) [A] 1-77 * figures 7,8 *;
 [A]FR2185497  (STEELASTIC CO [US]) [A] 1-77 * figures 28,28 *;
 [DA]GB1447030  (HYFIL LTD, et al) [DA] 1-77 * figure -; examples 1-3 *