Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971932

EP0971932 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING ORGANOSILANES USING A DISTRIBUTION REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / COLIN, Pascale
3, impasse Marc Seguin
F-69680 Chassieu / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Trolliet, Maurice , et al
RHODIA SERVICES
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
CRIT-Carrières
B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Trolliet, Maurice , et al
RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières - BP 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98917238.226.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998FR00610
Priority number, dateFR1997000401827.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9704018
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843984
Date:08.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971932
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971932
Date:05.06.2002
Language:FR
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07F7/12
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ORGANOSILANEN DURCH EINER REDISTRIBUTIONSREAKTIONS[2000/03]
English:METHOD FOR OBTAINING ORGANOSILANES USING A DISTRIBUTION REACTION[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'ORGANOSILANES METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE REACTION DE REDISTRIBUTION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2002Fee for grant paid
28.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2119477  (GEN ELECTRIC) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0743315  (DOW CORNING [US]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0147834  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *