Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974193 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974193



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 97
20.11.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.12.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.07.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
23.06.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.1999 Description Search / examination 3
28.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
01.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 22
08.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20