Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974193


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
10.10.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
22.11.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
30.11.2001 (Expected) grant published on  16.01.2002  [2002/03]
31.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
05.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.04.2001 Renewal fee
09.03.2001 First examination report
07.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
08.05.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
09.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication