Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974193
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0974193Global Dossier 16.01.2002B1
EP0974193 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9800660 01.04.1998
FR9704140 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69803173T 22.08.2002T2
DE69803173D 21.02.2002D1
Priority number Date
FR9800660 01.04.1998
FR9704140 04.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6310409 30.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
FR9800660 01.04.1998
FR9704140 04.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845945Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704140 04.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2761835 07.05.1999B1
FR2761835 09.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9704140 04.04.1997