Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974193

EP0974193 - OPTICALLY PROGRAMMABLE ARBITRARY TEMPORAL PROFILE ELECTRIC GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31/33, rue de la Fédération
75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / JOLLY, Alain
15 bis, rue de la Ville Neuve
F-28130 Houx / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Dubois-Chabert, Guy , et al
Société Brevatome, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98917286.101.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FR00660
Priority number, dateFR1997000414004.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704140
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845945
Date:15.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974193
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974193
Date:16.01.2002
Language:FR
[2002/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03K5/01, H03K5/159
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:OPTISCH PROGRAMMIERBARER ELEKTRISCHER GENERATOR FÜR PROFILE BELIEBIGER ZEITRELATION[2000/04]
English:OPTICALLY PROGRAMMABLE ARBITRARY TEMPORAL PROFILE ELECTRIC GENERATOR[2000/04]
French:GENERATEUR ELECTRIQUE DE PROFILS TEMPORELS ARBITRAIRES, PROGRAMMABLE OPTIQUEMENT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase25.09.1999National basic fee paid 
25.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
12.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2001Fee for grant paid
23.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT16.01.2002
NL16.01.2002
BE30.04.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2003/48]NL16.01.2002
BE30.04.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
Former [2003/31]NL16.01.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
Former [2003/09]NL16.01.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US4670662  (GOLDSTEIN YESHAYAHU S A ET AL) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4482816  (RICHARDSON ROBERT ET AL)
ExaminationUS4176285
 WO9723980