Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978007

EP0978007 - FIBRE OPTIC SPLICE CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Refusal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. RAYCHEM S.A.
Diestsesteenweg 692
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ALAERTS, Roger
Speelhovenstraat 6
B-3200 Aarschot / BE
02 / BUEKERS, Valere
Oude Schansstraat 26
B-3545 Zelem-Halen / BE
03 / DAEMS, Daniel
De Dreef van Zonnebos 10
B-2970 's-Gravenwezel / BE
04 / NOLF, Jean-Marie, Etienne
Bierbeekstraat 89
B-3360 Korbeek-Lo / BE
05 / ROOSEN, Dirk
Meendijk 54
B-3300 Tienen / BE
06 / VANONCKELEN, Marc
Rozenstraat 9
B-3545 Halen / BE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Beitsma, Gerhard Romano
Tyco Electronics UK Limited European Patent Department Farady Road Dorcan Swindon
Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Beitsma, Gerhard Romano
Raychem Limited, European IPLD, Faraday Road, Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB
Application number, filing date98917379.415.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998GB01107
Priority number, dateGB1997000819623.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708196
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848308
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978007
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:FASEROPTISCHE VERBINDUNGSMUFFE[2000/06]
English:FIBRE OPTIC SPLICE CLOSURE[2000/06]
French:FERMETURE D'UNE EPISSURE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
12.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
25.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/01]
04.08.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0744640  (ALCATEL CABLE INTERFACE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 11 * [Y] 1,4;
 [Y]DE4218378  (ROSE WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 43-57 *;
 [Y]JPH04275013  ;
 [Y]JPS5840509  ;
 [DY]US4805979  (BOSSARD RONALD G [US], et al) [DY] 1,4 * abstract * * column 7, lines 10-27 *;
 [A]JPH08237848
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930212), vol. 017, no. 071, Database accession no. (E - 1319), [Y] 1,4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830525), vol. 007, no. 121, Database accession no. (P - 199), [Y] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 097, no. 001, [A] 1 * abstract *