Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977879

EP0977879 - EUKARYOTIC GENE EXPRESSION CASSETTE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2008  [2008/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
5 Gower Street
London WC1E 6BT / GB
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDSPINK, Geoffrey
Royal Free Hospital School of Medicine
Rowland Hill Street, London NW3 2PF / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98917462.824.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998GB01198
Priority number, dateGB1997000852625.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9708526
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9849333
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977879
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/85, C12N15/56, A01K67/027, A61K48/00, A61K31/70
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:GEN EXPRESSIONSKASSETTE FÜR EUKARYOTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN[2000/06]
English:EUKARYOTIC GENE EXPRESSION CASSETTE AND USES THEREOF[2000/06]
French:CASSETTE D'EXPRESSION GENETIQUE EUCARYOTE ET SES UTILISATIONS[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/51]
31.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9428151  (ROYAL FREE HOSP SCHOOL MED [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10-13,18,21,22,24 * examples 1-5; claims 1-12 * [Y] 7,9,14-17,19,20,23;
 [PX]  - NOVO F J ET AL, "Gene transfer and expression of human alpha-galactosidase from mouse muscle in vitro and in vivo.", GENE THERAPY, (1997 MAY) 4 (5) 488-92. JOURNAL CODE: CCE. ISSN: 0969-7128., ENGLAND: UNITED KINGDOM, XP002073816 [PX] 1,2,5,7-13,18-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300410
 [Y]  - MEDIN J A ET AL, "CORRECTION IN TRANS FOR FABRY DISEASE: EXPRESSION, SECRETION, AND UPTAKE OF ALPHA-GALACTOSIDASE A IN PATIENT-DERIVED CELLS DRIVEN BY A HIGH-TITER RECOMBINANT RETROVIRAL VECTOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (19960723), vol. 93, no. 15, pages 7917 - 7922, XP002052041 [Y] 7,9,14-17,19,20,23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.15.7917
 [Y]  - ROTHMANN T ET AL, "HEART MUSCLE-SPECIFIC GENE EXPRESSION USING REPLICATION DEFECTIVE RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS", GENE THERAPY, (199610), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 919 - 926, XP000673471 [Y] 14-17 * figure 1 *
 [X]  - MUELLER F ET AL, "THE USE OF TRANSIENT LACZ EXPRESSION IN FISH EMBRYOS FOR COMPARATIVE ANALYSIS OF CLONED REGULATORY ELEMENTS", SEMINAR SERIES - SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, (199606), no. 58, pages 175 - 199, XP002056598 [X] 1,3,4,10-12 * page 183 - page 189; figures 3,5 *
 [X]  - KALLMEIER R C ET AL, "A NOVEL SMOOTH MUSCLE-SPECIFIC ENHANCER REGULATES TRANSCRIPTION OF THE SMOOTH MUSCLE MYOSIN HEAVY CHAIN GENE IN VASCULAR SMOOTH MUSCLECELLS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19951229), vol. 270, no. 52, pages 30949 - 30957, XP002053193 [X] 1,7,10-12 * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.52.30949