Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980536

EP0980536 - OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolic AG
Chamerstrasse 50
6301 Zug / CH
[2000/47]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Rolic AG
Innere Güterstrasse 2
6301 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SCHADT, Martin
Liestalerstrasse 77
CH-4411 Seltisberg / CH
02 / SEIBERLE, Hubert
Bodenseestrasse 1
D-79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Former [2000/08]Neville, Peter Warwick
Patents Division, BTG International Limited, 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane
London EC4M 7SB / GB
Application number, filing date98917484.208.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998IB00687
Priority number, dateCH1997000108209.05.1997         Original published format: CH 108297
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852077
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980536
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980536
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/30
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES BAUELEMENT[2000/08]
English:OPTICAL ELEMENT[2000/08]
French:ELEMENT OPTIQUE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2004Fee for grant paid
19.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04010031.5  / EP1447689
EP10183032.1  / EP2302424
EP10183036.2  / EP2302425
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.05.2004
IT26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/02]FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE26.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2286058  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2-4,6,9,11;
 [XA]US5548422  (CONNER ARLIE [US], et al) [X] 19,24 * column 6, line 13 - column 18, line 7; figures 1-13 * [A] 1,6-8,13,14,26;
 [DYA]EP0689065  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DY] 2-4,6,9,11 * the whole document * [A] 12,17,20-23,25-27,34,35 [Y] 16,18;
 [Y]EP0347063  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 16,18 * example 3 *;
 [DA]EP0689084  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DA] 1-6,13,14,16,19-26,28-31 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 58; figures 1-8; examples 3-9 *;
 [A]EP0768560  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12,28-31 * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 23 * * column 12, line 31 - column 14, line 6; figures 1,2,12 *;
 [A]EP0770889  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 28-31 * column 3, line 22 - column 7, line 39; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0753785  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 4-7,12-14 * page 3, line 8 - line 45; figures 3,4; examples 4-6 *;
 [A]JPH0968926
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 097, no. 007, & JP09068926 A 19970311 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 9,15,27,32,33,35 * abstract *