Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086475

EP1086475 - THE METHOD OF OBTAINING THE ADJUSTABLE CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.02.2006  [2006/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zakharian, Manvel
3812 Marquette Rue Fabreville, Laval
Quebec H7P 1S4 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Zakharian, Manvel
3812 Marquette Rue
Fabreville, Laval, Quebec H7P 1S4 / CA
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Zakharian, Manvel
Apartment 102, 5055 Notre-Dame Boulevard
Laval, Quebec H7W 1V6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Lauw, Rudolf
Karwinskistrasse 1
81247 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Lauw, Rudolf C. W., Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtschaftsing.
Karwinskistrasse 1
81247 München / DE
Application number, filing date98917491.711.05.1998
[2001/13]
WO1998IB00694
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9959171
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086475
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2001/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01G7/00, H01G4/40
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EINSTELLBAREN KONDENSATORS[2001/13]
English:THE METHOD OF OBTAINING THE ADJUSTABLE CAPACITOR[2001/13]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CONDENSATEUR REGLABLE[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2000National basic fee paid 
16.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/13]
07.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/05]
05.10.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/05]
Appeal following examination11.07.2003Appeal received No.  T0735/03
02.09.2003Statement of grounds filed
14.12.2005Interlocutory revision of appeal
14.12.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
05.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
08.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US5600187  (EL-HAMAMSY SAYED-AMR [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 45; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2091038  (CLARION CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US3778645  (MATTAUCH R, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *