Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994827

EP0994827 - INFRARED RADIATION EMITTING CERAMIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakhimov, Rustam
Ergashev Street, 54
Tashkent, 700084 / UZ
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Syvänen, Ralf Ossian , et al
Kolster OY AB
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Syvänen, Ralf Ossian , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98917528.615.05.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998IB00738
Priority number, dateUZ1997000054530.06.1997         Original published format: UZ 9700545
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901401
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994827
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994827
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/42
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:INFRAROTSTRAHLUNG EMITTIERENDES KERAMISCHES MATERIAL[2000/17]
English:INFRARED RADIATION EMITTING CERAMIC MATERIAL[2000/17]
French:MATIERE CERAMIQUE EMETTRICE DE RAYONNEMENT INFRAROUGE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2000National basic fee paid 
21.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.01.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
27.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2001Fee for grant paid
19.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
CH12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
FR12.09.2001
IT12.09.2001
LI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
SE12.12.2001
GR14.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
LU15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
CH12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
FR12.09.2001
LI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
SE12.12.2001
GR14.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
LU15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2005/01]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
SE12.12.2001
GR14.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
LU15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2004/39]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
SE12.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
LU15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2004/16]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
SE12.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2004/10]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
CY31.05.2002
Former [2004/04]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
Former [2003/46]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
DK12.12.2001
PT12.12.2001
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
Former [2003/29]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
GB15.05.2002
IE15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
Former [2003/25]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
GB15.05.2002
MC15.05.2002
Former [2003/17]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
GB15.05.2002
Former [2003/09]AT12.09.2001
BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
Former [2002/29]BE12.09.2001
FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
Former [2002/27]FI12.09.2001
PT12.12.2001
Former [2002/15]FI12.09.2001
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9326011  (MITECH SCIENT CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 7 - line 32 * * page 31, line 26 - line 33 * * page 33, line 1 - line 8 *