Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999684

EP0999684 - CONNECTION MANAGEMENT SERVICING METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Yoshiko Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98917632.622.04.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998JP01853
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9955068
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999684
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M15/02
[2003/05]
Former International [2000/19]H04M3/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/19]
TitleGerman:DIENSTVERFAHREN FÜR DIE VERBINDUNGSSTEUERUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSKANALS[2000/19]
English:CONNECTION MANAGEMENT SERVICING METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION CHANNEL[2000/19]
French:PROCEDE POUR SERVICE DE GESTION DE CONNEXION POUR CANAL DE COMMUNICATION[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase15.11.1999Translation filed 
15.11.1999National basic fee paid 
15.11.1999Search fee paid 
15.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
20.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
26.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPS5686565  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO);
 [Y]JPH0730657  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [Y]JPH0993339  (NEC COMMUNICATION SYST);
 [A]JPH06261061  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JPH0522414  (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG)