Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0930091

EP0930091 - METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.2005  [2005/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JFE Engineering Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/13]For all designated states
JFE Engineering Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
NKK CORPORATION
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAMAGUCHI, Keizo, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
02 / OSADA, Yo, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
03 / NOTO, Takashi, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
04 / AYUKAWA, Susumu, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
05 / FUJII, Satoshi, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
06 / KURODA, Manabu, NKK Corporation
1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[1999/29]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98917639.123.04.1998
[1999/29]
WO1998JP01862
Priority number, dateJP1997012294625.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12294697
JP1997012294725.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12294797
[1999/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848924
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0930091
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[1999/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930091
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/70, B01D53/40, B01D53/68, B01D53/50
[2000/04]
Former International [1999/29]B01D53/70, B01D53/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB [1999/29]
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUR ABGASBEHANDLUNG[1999/29]
English:METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS[1999/29]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES EMANATIONS GAZEUSES[1999/29]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1998Translation filed 
17.12.1998National basic fee paid 
17.12.1998Search fee paid 
17.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/29]
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2004Fee for grant paid
13.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9616721  (FLAEKT AB [SE], et al) [A] 5-17 * claim - *
International search[X]JPH05285335  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO);
 [Y]JPH0731847  (KOBE STEEL LTD);
 [Y]JPH0531323  (NIPPON KOKAN KK);
 [A]JPH02298316  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO);
 [A]JPH01212809  (CHUSHO KIGYO JIGYODAN)