EP1074545 - ISOQUINOLINESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidaka, Hiroyoshi 3-A, 607 Otokikiyama, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 468-0063 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Hidaka, Hiroyoshi 3-A, 607 Otokikiyama, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 468-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDAKA, Hiroyoshi 607, Otokikiyama Tempaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 468-0063 / JP | 02 /
MURAMATSU, Hiroshi 27-10, Nishihirayama 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0055 / JP | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98917644.1 | 23.04.1998 | [2001/06] | WO1998JP01868 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954306 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074545 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/02, C07D217/24, C07D401/12, A61K31/495, A61K31/55, C08G64/14 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07D217/02 (EP);
C07D217/04 (EP);
C07D217/24 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | C07D217/02, C07D217/24, C07D401/12, A61K31/495, A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | ISOCHINOLINSULFONAMID-DERIVATE UND SIE ALS AKTIVEN BESTANDTEIL ENTHALTENDE MEDIKAMENTE | [2001/06] | English: | ISOQUINOLINESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2001/06] | French: | DERIVES ISOQUINOLINESULFONAMIDE ET MEDICAMENTS INTEGRANT CES DERIVES COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2000 | Translation filed | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2000 | 30.04.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5733904 (FUJII YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * columns 2-3; claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP0061673 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 29; claim 1 * * page 18, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO9806433 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | EP0956865 [ ] (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [ ] * page 8, paragraphs 17,18 * * page 17; examples 204-221 * * page 18; examples 222-226,241-249,264-272 * | [X] - SATO T ET AL, "INHIBITION OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 REPLICATION BY A BIOAVAILABLE SERINE/THREONINE KINASE INHIBITOR, FASUDIL HYDROCHLORIDE", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES,NEW YORK, NY,US, (19980301), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 293 - 298, XP000999983 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS57156463 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND, et al); | [X]JPS58121279 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND, et al); | [X]JPS61152658 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND, et al); | [X]JPS61227581 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND, et al); | [X]JPS61293914 (HIDAKA HIROYOSHI); | [X]JPH02256617 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |