Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979847

EP0979847 - WATER-SOLUBLE TRISAZO COMPOUNDS, AQUEOUS INK COMPOSITION AND COLORED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ONO, Hiroaki
3-11-7, Azusawa Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-0051 / JP
02 / MIYAZAWA, Takashi
3-33-5, Shimo Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-0042 / JP
03 / TABEI, Toru
8-90-50, Azuma Kitamoto-shi
Saitama 364-0007 / JP
04 / SHIRASAKI, Yasuo
61-7, Minaminakano Omiya-shi
Saitama 330-0826 / JP
05 / YAMAGUCHI, Isao
1-19-4, Nishimatsugaoka Nagareyama-shi
Chiba 270-0142 / JP
06 / NAGASAKI, Kazunobu
14-15-310, Kanayama-cho Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0014 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98917653.223.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998JP01877
Priority number, dateJP1997012012124.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12012197
[2000/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847970
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979847
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979847
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09B31/16, C09B69/02, C09D11/02
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/07]
TitleGerman:WASSERLÖSLICHE TRISAZOVERBINDUNGEN, WÄSSRIGE TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE GEFÄRBTER GEGENSTAND[2000/07]
English:WATER-SOLUBLE TRISAZO COMPOUNDS, AQUEOUS INK COMPOSITION AND COLORED ARTICLE[2000/07]
French:COMPOSES TRIAZO HYDROSOLUBLES, COMPOSITION D'ENCRE A L'EAU ET ARTICLE COLORE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999Translation filed 
20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Search fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
20.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
05.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2002Fee for grant paid
26.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPS55144067  ;
 []JPS55144067  (CANON KK) [ ] * page 582, dyestuff nr. 13 *;
 [A]NL64232C  (I. G. FARBENINDUSTRIE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,4,5,8 * example - *;
 [A]EP0446620  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,9-11 * examples 2,3; claim - *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810130), vol. 005, no. 016, Database accession no. (C - 041), [DA] 1,3,4,7,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - THE SOCIETY OF DYERS AND COLORISTS, COLOUR INDEX, (19720509), vol. 4, XP002146105 [A] 1,3,4,7,8 * page 4297; Direct dye of number: C.I. 31655 *
International search[A]JPH05105833  (CANON KK);
 [A]JPH0673320  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND);
 [A]JPS62257971  (CIBA GEIGY AG)