Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975864

EP0975864 - FEED AND FILTERING SYSTEM FOR LIQUID MEDIA SUCH AS FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BJÖRNSSON, Aegir
Vallgatan 17
S-450 43 Smögen / SE
For all designated states
Björnsson, Björn
Vallgatan 17
450 43 Smögen / SE
For all designated states
Corneliusson, Arvid
Fanahammaren 3
5047 Fana / NO
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date98917832.224.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998SE00533
Priority number, dateSE1997000144518.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701445
[2000/05]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848164
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975864
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975864
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/00, F02M37/22, B60K15/03
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:ZUFUHR- UND FILTERSYSTEM FÜR FLÜSSIGE MEDIA WIE ZUM BEISPIEL BRENNSTOFF[2000/05]
English:FEED AND FILTERING SYSTEM FOR LIQUID MEDIA SUCH AS FUELS[2000/05]
French:SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION ET DE FILTRATION D'UN AGENT LIQUIDE TEL QUE DU CARBURANT[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1998Translation filed 
12.10.1999National basic fee paid 
12.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
31.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2001Fee for grant paid
26.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9411630  (SAAB AUTOMOBILE [SE], et al);
 [A]US4911134  (OLSSON GOERAN [SE])