Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977699

EP0977699 - A REEL-UP WITH DOUBLE SECONDARY UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper Karlstad Aktiebolag
Box 1014
651 15 Karlstad / SE
[2002/02]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Valmet-Karlstad AB
Box 1014
651 15 Karlstad / SE
Inventor(s)01 / EKSTRÖM, Göran
Hagalund,Vee 231
S-660 57 Väse / SE
02 / KARLSSON, Roland
Lelle Karl-Johans väg 9
S-656 38 Karlstad / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Tommy
Ättestigen 8
S-416 74 Göteborg / SE
04 / ÖNNERLÖV, Lars-Erik
Anna Svärds väg 1
S-653 46 Karlstad / SE
 [2003/30]
Former [2000/06]01 / EKSTRÖM, Göran
Hagalund Vee
S-660 57 Väse / SE
02 / KARLSSON, Roland
Lelle Karl-Johans väg 9
S-656 38 Karlstad / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Tommy
Ättestigen 8
S-416 74 Göteborg / SE
04 / ÖNNERLÖV, Lars-Erik
Anna Svärds väg 1
S-653 46 Karlstad / SE
Representative(s)Lundquist, Lars-Olof
L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB
Box 80
651 03 Karlstad / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Lundquist, Lars-Olof
L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB, Box 80
651 03 Karlstad / SE
Application number, filing date98917877.709.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998SE00662
Priority number, dateSE1997000147021.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701470
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847801
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977699
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977699
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/22, B65H18/26
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:WICKELMASCHINE MIT DOPPELTEN HILFEINHEITEN[2000/06]
English:A REEL-UP WITH DOUBLE SECONDARY UNITS[2000/06]
French:ENROULEUSE DOTEE D'UNITES SECONDAIRES DOUBLES[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2003Fee for grant paid
30.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9615059  (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]);
 [A]WO9606033  (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]);
 [A]DE1574632  (ZUM BRUDERHAUS GMBH MASCHF);
 [A]WO9324401  (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]);
 [A]WO9713714  (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])