Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019749

EP1019749 - A DEVICE FOR DETERMINING NUCLIDE CONTENTS OF RADIOACTIVE INERT GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westinghouse Atom AB
721 63 Västeras / SE
[2001/12]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
ABB ATOM AB
721 63 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BJURMAN, Björn
Majvägen 15
S-742 35 Östhammar / SE
02 / SIHVER, Lembit
Norra Allégatan 37 C
S-722 19 Väster s / SE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Israelsson, Stefan , et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB
P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Israelsson, Stefan , et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/29]Bornegard, Annette
ABB AB, Patent
721 78 Västeras / SE
Application number, filing date98917902.315.04.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998SE00689
Priority number, dateSE1997000140716.04.1997         Original published format: SE 9701407
[2000/29]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847023
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019749
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019749
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/167, G01T1/24
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   LI [2000/29]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES NUKLEIDGEHALTS RADIOAKTIVER EDELGASE[2000/29]
English:A DEVICE FOR DETERMINING NUCLIDE CONTENTS OF RADIOACTIVE INERT GASES[2000/29]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DES NUCLEIDES CONTENUS DANS DES GAZ INERTES RADIOACTIFS[2002/37]
Former [2000/29]DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DES NUCLIDES CONTENUS DANS DES GAZ INERTES RADIOACTIFS
Entry into regional phase22.10.1998Translation filed 
03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/29]
16.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2002Fee for grant paid
27.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9429745  (FORSMARKS KRAFTGRUPP AB [SE], et al);
 [A]US5537450  (ASAY ROGER H [US], et al)