EP0989800 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOGNISING AND DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A PART OF AN ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeLaval Holding AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB Farm Center, P.O. Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Lars Ymervägen 19 S-151 60 Södertälje / SE | 02 /
NILSSON, Mats Scheelevägen 27 S-147 31 Tumba / SE | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/14] | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Lars Ymervägen 19 S-151 60 Södertälje / SE | ||
02 /
NILSSON, Mats Skarpbrunnavägen 207 S-145 64 Norsborg / SE | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98917935.3 | 23.04.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998SE00744 | Priority number, date | SE19970001547 | 23.04.1997 Original published format: SE 9701547 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9847348 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0989800 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989800 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/017, G06T1/00, G06T7/00, G06T7/60 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G01B11/25 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
G06V10/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES TIERTEILS | [2000/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOGNISING AND DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A PART OF AN ANIMAL | [2000/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER ET DE DETERMINER LA POSITION D'UNE PARTIE D'UN ANIMAL | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE WestfaliaSurge GmbH Werner-Habig-Str. 1 59302 Oelde / DE Opponents representative Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE WestfaliaSurge GmbH Werner-Habig-Str. 1 59302 Oelde / DE Opponents representative Neumann, Ditmar Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | |||
Former [2004/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE WestfaliaSurge GmbH Werner-Habig-Str. 1 59302 Oelde / DE Opponents representative Neumann, Ditmar Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser, Postfach 10 33 63 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
25.11.2003
14.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | 19.01.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.10.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/11] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 21.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4867103 (MONTALESCOT JEAN-BERNARD [FR], et al); | [A]US5446835 (IIDA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5483441 (SCOFIELD WAYNE W [US]); | [A]EP0727355 (GREEFS WAGEN CARROSSERIE [NL]) |