Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976477

EP0976477 - ELECTROSLAG FACING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zakrytoe Aktsionernoe Obschestvo "Elmet-Rol-Gruppa Medovara"
11, Bozhenko St.
Kyiv 150, 03680 / UA
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / MEDOVAR, Boris I.
ul. A.Barbjusa, 22/26-109
Kiev, 252005 / UA
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Peltonen, Antti Sakari , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Peltonen, Antti Sakari , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98917940.319.01.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998UA00003
Priority number, dateUA1997003118518.03.1997         Original published format: UA 97031185
[2000/05]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841343
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976477
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976477
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU24.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B22D19/08, B22D19/00, C22B9/18, // B23P6/02
[2001/16]
Former International [2000/05]B22D19/08, // B23P6/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG MITTELS DES ELEKTROSCHLACKEVERFAHRENS[2000/05]
English:ELECTROSLAG FACING PROCESS[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT SOUS LAITIER[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999Translation filed 
17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Search fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
28.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2003Fee for grant paid
14.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200104   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2001
31.01.200205   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2002
31.01.200306   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
AT19.01.2004
GB19.01.2004
ES20.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
FR31.01.2004
[2008/43]
Former [2006/12]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
AT19.01.2004
GB19.01.2004
ES20.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2005/36]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
AT19.01.2004
GB19.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2005/14]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
GB19.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2005/01]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
GB19.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
Former [2004/52]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
SE20.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI01.10.2003
GR01.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI01.10.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6063330  ;
 [A]US5146976  (BRAMBLETT JOHN D [AU]) [A] 1-6 * claims 10-12 *;
 [A]SU1498587  ;
 [A]JPS5762839  ;
 [A]JPH07155932
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850813), vol. 009, no. 196, Database accession no. (C - 297), & JP60063330 A 19850411 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 06, Database accession no. 1990-043453, XP002161592 & SU1498587 A 19890807 (ROSTSELMASH) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820731), vol. 006, no. 142, Database accession no. (M - 146), & JP57062839 A 19820416 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07155932 A 19950620 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]SU286720  (INST ELEKTROSWARKI PATONA [SU]);
 [A]RU2069614  (SIBIRSK METALL INST [SU]);
 [A]WO8101812  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]);
 [A]WO9422619  (FORCAST INT [FR], et al);
 [A]US5419973  (HASHIMOTO MITSUO [JP], et al)
 [A]  - "Elektroshlakovaya Svarka i Naplavka", Under Editorship, B.E. PATONA, MOSCOW, 'Mashinostroenie', 1980, pages 281-284.,