Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979112

EP0979112 - WINGED IV SET WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHAW, Thomas J.
1510 Hillcrest
Little Elm, TX 75068 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98917968.402.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US06308
Priority number, dateUS1997084576218.04.1997         Original published format: US 845762
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847550
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979112
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979112
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:INTRAVENÖSER SATZ MIT FLÜGELN UND EINZIEHBARER NADEL[2000/07]
English:WINGED IV SET WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE[2000/07]
French:SYSTEME INTRAVENEUX A AILETTES AVEC AIGUILLE RETRACTABLE[2003/36]
Former [2000/07]SYSTEME DE PROJECTION AUTOSTEREOSCOPIQUE
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Search fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
17.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5389085  (D ALESSIO ET AL.) [A] 1-17 * column A; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0566769  (INT. SAFETYJECT IND., INC.)
International search[A]US5120320  ;
 [A]US5330438  ;
 [A]US5192275