Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973566

EP0973566 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COLLECTING BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INJECTIMED, INC.
2737 Palma Drive
Ventura, CA 93003-7651 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
InjectiMed, Inc.
2737 Palma Drive
Ventura, CA 93003-7651 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KURACINA, Thomas, C.
353 Mariposa Drive
Ventura, CA 93001 / US
02 / OHNEMUS, Randall, E.
9648 Halifax Street
Ventura, CA 93004 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Maury, Richard Philip
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Ltd
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans
Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Maury, Richard Philip
Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date98918051.808.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07009
Priority number, dateUS19970042978P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 42978 P
US19970055517P13.08.1997         Original published format: US 55517 P
US19970062292P17.10.1997         Original published format: US 62292 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844970
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973566
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/178, B65D39/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SAMMELN VON BLUT[2000/04]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COLLECTING BLOOD[2000/04]
French:TECHNIQUE DE PRELEVEMENT DE SANG ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Search fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
31.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/20]
09.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4256120  (FINLEY MICHAEL J);
 [X]US3709365  (CZAPLINSKI T, et al);
 [X]US5653695  (HOPKINS DAVID P [US], et al);
 [Y]US4098934  (BROCKWAY M CLIFFORD, et al);
 [A]US5399318  (MANCILLA EDWARD [US], et al);
 [A]US5476509  (KEOGH JAMES R [US], et al);
 [A]US4372325  (RAITTO RUSSELL G);
 [A]US4492634  (VILLA-REAL ANTONY-EUCLID C [US]);
 [A]US4349035  (THOMAS JOSEPH J, et al);
 [A]US4296759  (JOSLIN JOEL A, et al);
 [A]US4150089  (LINET MICHAEL S)
by applicantUS3848579