Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973865

EP0973865 - ATTENUATED, INVASIVE VACCINES AGAINST FISH PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE
Room 104F LSU Agriculture Center Building P.O.Box 25055 Baton Rouge
LA 70895-5505 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE
Room 104F LSU Agriculture Center Building P.O.Box 25055
Baton Rouge LA 70895-5055 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THUNE, Ronald, L.
2830 Calanne Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US
02 / COOPER, Richard, K.
39039 David Drive
Prairieville, LA 70769 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [2000/04]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date98918062.509.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07066
Priority number, dateUS19970043768P11.04.1997         Original published format: US 43768 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9846725
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973865
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/21, A61K39/02, A61K39/295, A61K39/102, // A61K39/205, A61K39/245
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesCY,   ES,   GR,   IT,   PT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ABGESCHWÄCHTE, INVASIVE IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN FISCHPATHOGENEN[2000/04]
English:ATTENUATED, INVASIVE VACCINES AGAINST FISH PATHOGENS[2000/04]
French:VACCINS VIVANTS ATTENUES DIRIGES CONTRE DES ICHTYOPATHOGENES[2000/04]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
22.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
25.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9516045  (US AGRICULTURE [US], et al) [Y] 43-76 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH05139994  ;
 [Y]WO9113978  (TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN [IE], et al) [Y] 43-60 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5354555  (LEONG JO-ANN C [US]) [Y] 8,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0512260  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]);
 [A]US5536658  (SHOTTS JR EMMETT B [US], et al);
 [XY]  - FERNANDEZ ET AL., "ISOLATION, SEQUENCING AND MUTATION OF THE EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI aroA GENE", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF AM. SOC. MICROBIOL. 96 (0), (19960519), page 240, XP002084769 [X] 1-5,9-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,16-21,43-60
 [XY]  - LAWRENCE ET AL., "CLONING,SEQUENCING AND INSERTION MUTAGENESIS OF THE purA GENE FROM EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI", ABSTRACTS OF THE GENERAL MEETING OF AM. SOC. MICROBIOL. 96 (0), (19960519), page 239, XP002084770 [X] 22-26,30-36 * the whole document * [Y] 27-29,37-42,61-76
 [Y]  - HORMAECHE, "LIVE ATTENUATED SALMONELLA VACCINES AND THEIR POTENTIAL AS ORAL COMBINED VACCINES CARRYING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIGENS", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1991), vol. 142, pages 113 - 120, XP002084771 [Y] 6-8,16-21,27-29,37-42,48,49,64,65 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(91)90298-T
 [Y]  - O'CALLAGHAN, "CHARACTERIZATION OF AROMATIC-AND PURINE-DEPENDENT SALMONELLA TYPHIMURIUM: ATTENTION,PERSISTENCE, AND ABILITY TO INDUCE PROTECTIVE IMMUNITY IN BALB/c MICE", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1988), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 419 - 423, XP002084772 [Y] 43-76 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "MIXED VACCINE FOR MARINE FISH-COMPRISES MIXTURE OF TWO OR MORE PHENOL-LPS, FORMALIN INACTIVATED AND ATTENUATED LIVE VACCINES OF PASTEURELLA PISCICIDA", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 93-216675, XP002084776 & JPH05139994 A 19930608 (CHOKAN) [Y] 43-76 * abstract *
 [DY]  - DAVISON, "CHANNEL CATFISH VIRUS: A NEW TYPE OF HERPESVIRUS", VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 186, pages 9 - 14, XP002084773 [DY] 8,29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90056-U
 [DY]  - HEPPELL ET AL., "STRAIN VARIABILITY AND LOCALIZATION OF IMPORTANT EPITOPES ON THE MAJOR STRUCTURAL PROTEIN (VP2) OF INFECTIOUS PANCREATIC NECROSIS VIRUS", VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 214, pages 40 - 49, XP002084774 [DY] 8,29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1995.9956
 [PXY]  - LAWRENCE, "ATTENUATION,PERSISTENCE, AND VACCINE POTENTIAL OF AN EDWARDSIELLA ICTALURI purA MUTANT", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199711), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4642 - 4651, XP002084775 [PX] 22-26,30-36 * the whole document * [PY] 27-29,37-42,61-76
Examination   - THUNE ET AL: 'Construction of a safe, stable, efficacious vaccine against Photobacterium damselae ssp. piscicida' DISEASES OF AQUATIC ORGANISMS vol. 57, 03 December 2003, pages 51 - 58