Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007892

EP1007892 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/24]PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PRODUCTS
[2009/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 16.05.2012  [2012/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rokon Systems, Inc.
501 Madison Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2011/24]
Former [2010/35]For all designated states
Nucon Systems Inc.
Suite 1500, 15th floor, 2 Penn Plaza
New York, NY 10121 / US
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Nucon Systems Inc.
Suite 1500, 15th floor, 2 Penn Plaza
New York, NY 10121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROKHVARGER, Anatoly, E.
Apartment 4B, 1865 Ocean Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11230 / US
02 / KHIZH, Adam, B.
101 Prospect Avenue - 2K
Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Gill, David Alan , et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Gill, David Alan , et al
W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2009/22]Hoffmeister, Helmut , et al
Dr. Hoffmeister & Bischof Postfach 3803
48021 Münster / DE
Former [2000/24]Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date98918089.810.04.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US07198
Priority number, dateUS19970043122P10.04.1997         Original published format: US 43122 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845654
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007892
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007892
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B28B1/087, B28B3/20, B28B11/24, C04B35/64, F27B9/26, F27B9/30, F27D5/00, F27D3/12
[2009/41]
Former International [2004/18]F26B13/10, B28B17/02, C04B35/628
Former International [2000/24]F26B13/10, B28B1/08, B28B1/26, F27D3/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT DICKEN WANDUNGEN[2009/41]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PRODUCTS[2009/41]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE PRODUITS EN CERAMIQUE A PAROI EPAISSE[2009/41]
Former [2000/24]VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT DICKEN WANDUNGEN
Former [2000/24]PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THICK-WALLED CERAMIC PRODUCTS
Former [2000/24]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA PREPARATION DE PRODUITS EN CERAMIQUE A PAROI EPAISSE
Entry into regional phase06.11.1999National basic fee paid 
06.11.1999Search fee paid 
06.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
20.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
18.06.2010Fee for grant paid
18.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
18.06.2010Request for further processing filed
18.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.07.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
12.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
30.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2001
30.04.200508   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
30.04.200912   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
ES12.12.2010
IE10.04.2011
[2012/20]
Former [2011/35]FI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
ES12.12.2010
Former [2011/27]FI01.09.2010
IT01.09.2010
SE01.09.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US4338135  (COOK HILBERT F) [A] 1,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS61199001
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870127), vol. 011, no. 028, Database accession no. (M - 557), & JP61199001 A 19860903 (INOUE JAPAX RES INC) [A] 1,8,9,20,36,37 * abstract *
International search[A]US4963709  (KIMREY JR HAROLD D [US]);
 [Y]US4564493  (SHINTANI TSUNEO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4935178  (ESPOSITO ARTHUR N [US], et al);
 [Y]US5260011  (WOLTER PETER A [US], et al);
 [Y]US4319410  (HEILHECKER JOE K, et al);
 [A]US4285669  (WALCHHUTTER ULRICO);
 [X]US4375354  (HENRIKSSON ROY [SE])