Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036075

EP1036075 - SUBSTITUTED THIAZOLIDINEDIONE AND OXAZOLIDINEDIONE HAVING ANTIDIABETIC, HYPOLIPIDEMIA AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.
7-1-27, Ameerpet
Hyderabad 500 016 / IN
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]For all designated states
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.
7-1-27 Ameerpet
Hyderabad 500 016 / IN
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
DR. REDDY'S RESEARCH FOUNDATION
7-1-27 Ameerpet
Hyderabad, 500 016 Andhra Pradesh / IN
For all designated states
Reddy-Cheminor, Inc.
66 South Maple Avenue
Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LOHRAY, Vidya, Bhushan
Zydus Research Centre,Zydus Tower,Satellite Cross
Ahmebad-380 015Hyderabad 500 033 / IN
02 / LOHRAY, Braj, Bhushan
Zydus Research Centre,Zydus Tower,Satellite Cross
Jubilee Hills, Hyderabad 500 033 / IN
03 / PARASELLI, Rao, Bheema
H. No. 5-8,Deeptisri Nagar
Miyapur, Hyderabad 500 050 / IN
04 / RAMANUJAM, Rajagopalan
2B, Vishaal Towers,8-3-682, Navodaya Colony
Yellareddyguda, Hyderabad 500 873 / IN
05 / CHAKRABARTI, Ranjan
Flat No. 104,Ravi Teja Apartments
283/3RT, S.R. Nagar, Hyberabad 500 038 / IN
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/38]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98918108.610.04.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998US07284
Priority number, dateUS1997098291102.12.1997         Original published format: US 982911
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845291
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036075
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036075
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D417/12, A61K31/425, C07D265/22, C07D277/34, C07D239/90
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesAL15.11.1999
LT15.11.1999
LV15.11.1999
RO15.11.1999
SI15.11.1999
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE THIAZOLIDINEDIONE UND OXAZOLIDINEDIONE MIT ANTIDIABETISCHEN,HYPOLIPIDÄMISCHEN UND ANTIHYPERTENSIVEN EIGENSCHAFTEN[2000/38]
English:SUBSTITUTED THIAZOLIDINEDIONE AND OXAZOLIDINEDIONE HAVING ANTIDIABETIC, HYPOLIPIDEMIA AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE PROPERTIES[2000/38]
French:OXALIDINEDIONE ET THIAZOLIDINEDIONE A SUBSTITUTION, ANTIDIABETIQUES, HYPOLIPIDEMIQUES ET ANTIHYPERTENSEURS[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase15.11.1999National basic fee paid 
15.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/38]
03.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2004Fee for grant paid
15.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
IT23.06.2004
NL23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
PT23.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/47]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
NL23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI23.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0787727  (SS PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9741097  (REDDY RESEARCH FOUNDATION [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0678511  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 8,9,19 * See page 77,preparation 19 *;
 [Y]EP0676398  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [Y] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * claim - *;
 [YD]EP0306228  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [YD] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0419035  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * claim - *;
 [Y]  - CANTELLO B C C ET AL, "OMEGA(HETEROCYCLYLAMINO)ALKOXYBENZYL-2,4-THIAZOLIDINEDIONES AS POTENT ANTIHYPERGLYCEMIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19940101), vol. 37, no. 23, pages 3977 - 3985, XP002011745 [Y] 1-5,12-16,20-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00049a017
 [A]  - HUSAIN M I ET AL, "SOME NEW 2-ARYLOXYMETHYL-3-ALPHA-SUBSTITUTED CARBOXYMETHYL-6,8-SUBSTITUTED-4-QUINAZOLONES AS POSSIBLE ANTICONVULSANTS", PHARMAZIE, (1982), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 408 - 410, XP002045115 [A] 6,7,18 * the whole document *