Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976210

EP0976210 - UNIFIED ACCESS PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Next Level Communications, Inc.
6085 State Farm Drive
Rohnert Park, CA 94928 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Next Level Communications, Inc.
6085 State Farm Drive
Rohnert Park, California 94928 / US
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Next Level Communications
6085 State Farm Drive
Rohnert Park, CA 94928 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EAMES, Thomas, R.
5206 Pressley Road
Santa Rosa, CA 95404 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2000/05]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98918136.713.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07347
Priority number, dateUS19970043811P14.04.1997         Original published format: US 43811 P
US1997090577504.08.1997         Original published format: US 905775
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9847251
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976210
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2005/41]
Former International [2000/05]H04J1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LU,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VEREINHEITLICHTE ZUGANGSPLATFORM[2000/05]
English:UNIFIED ACCESS PLATFORM[2000/05]
French:PLATE-FORME D'ACCES UNIFIEE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Search fee paid 
14.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
09.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/02]
27.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200407   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US5613190  (HYLTON DENNY L [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,12,14,15 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 35; figure 1 * * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 37 *;
 [A]  HAUWERMEIREN VAN L ET AL VERBAND DEUTSCHER ELEKTROTECHNIKER (VDE) ET AL, "OFFERING VIDEO SERVICES OVER TWISTED PAIR CABLES TO THE RESIDENTIALSUBSCRIBER BY MEANS OF AN ATM BASED ADSL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM", ISS '95. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). ADVANCED SWITCHING TECHNOLOGIES FOR UNIVERSAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS AT THE BEGINNING OF THE 21ST. CENTURY. BERLIN, APR. 23 - 28, 1995, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWIT, (19950423), VOL. 1 SYMP. 15, ISBN 3-8007-2093-0, pages 447 - 451, XP000495611 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0003]; figure 2 *
International search[X]US5613190  (HYLTON DENNY L [US]);
 [Y]US4441180  (SCHUESSLER HANS [DE]);
 [Y]US5668857  (MCHALE JOHN F [US])