Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975281

EP0975281 - RADIAL POCKET FORMING AND INSERT POSITIONING INSTRUMENTS, CORNEAL MARKER, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KERAVISION, INC.
48630 Milmont Drive Fremont
California 94538-7353 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
KERAVISION, INC.
48630 Milmont Drive
Fremont, California 94538-7353 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PROUDFOOT, Robert, A.
3511 Tracy Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
02 / SILVESTRINI, Thomas, A.
1701 Las Trampas Road
Alamo, CA 94507 / US
03 / GANDIONCO, Isidro, Matias
36520 Alder Court
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
04 / SCHOLL, John, Anthony
14 Woodranch Circle
Danville, CA 94506 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98918201.914.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07507
Priority number, dateUSP 4351314.04.1997
USA14.04.1998
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9846192
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975281
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/14
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:POSITIONIERINSTRUMENTE FÜR RADIAL TASCHENGEFORMTE EINSÄTZE UND MARKIEREINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE AUGENHORNHAUT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN GEBRAUCH[2000/05]
English:RADIAL POCKET FORMING AND INSERT POSITIONING INSTRUMENTS, CORNEAL MARKER, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME[2000/05]
French:INSTRUMENTS DE FORMATION DE POCHES RADIALES ET DE POSITIONNEMENT D'INSERTS, MARQUEUR CORNEEN, ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CES INSTRUMENTS[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1999National basic fee paid 
28.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
02.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
07.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4880017  (SOLL DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 23-25,28-32,34-36 * column 4, line 26 - line 60; figure - * * column 9, line 1 - line 32 *;
 [A]EP0541316  (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [A] 23,24,27-29,31-34,36,37 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 4; figure - *;
 [A]US4739761  (GRANDON STANLEY C [US]) [A] 23,24,28,29,31,32,34,36 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9640005  (KERAVISION INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO9320763  (KERAVISION INC [US]) [A] 38,45,46,49,50 * page 19, line 12 - page 20, line 1; figure - *;
 [A]WO9301755  (EATON ALEXANDER M [US], et al) [A] 38 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 7; figure - *;
 [A]WO9606582  (UNIV MIAMI [US]) [A] 52,53,62,63 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4301418  (ADATOMED PHARMA & MED [DE]) [A] 52,62 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 48; figure - *;
 [PX]WO9803136  (KERAVISION INC [US], et al) [PX] 38,45,46,49-53,62-64 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4815463
 US4688570
 US4941093
 US4452235
 US4671276
 US4766895
 US4961744
 US5300118