Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973801

EP0973801 - GnRH ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferring B.V.
Marsstraat 9, P.O. Box 3129
2130 KC Hoofddorp / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
FERRING B.V.
Marsstraat 9, P.O. Box 3129
2130 KC Hoofddorp / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Guangcheng
Apartment 39 8020 Avenida Navidad
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / SEMPLE, Graeme
2 Station Road
Romsey Hampshire SO51 8DP / GB
03 / Rivier, Jean E.F., Dr.
9674 Blackgold Road
La Jolla CA 92037 / US
 [2002/27]
Former [2000/04]01 / JIANG, Guangcheng
Apartment 39 8020 Avenida Navidad
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / SEMPLE, Graeme
2 Station Road
Romsey Hampshire SO51 8DP / GB
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98918206.813.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US07519
Priority number, dateUS1997083704111.04.1997         Original published format: US 837041
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846635
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973801
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973801
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/23, A61K38/09, G01N33/74
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:GnRH ANTAGONISTEN[2000/04]
English:GnRH ANTAGONISTS[2000/04]
French:ANTAGONISTES DE GnRH[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2002Fee for grant paid
20.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/44]CY13.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9106543  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI) [X] 1,3,6,9,11,13 * example 150; claims 1,3,7,10,20-22,25 *;
 [DY]WO9525741  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI) [DY] 1-5,7-13 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO9217025  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI) [DY] 1-5,7-9,11-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9618642  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI) [Y] 1-6,9-13 * The whole document; see especially page 31 *;
 [PY]WO9722622  (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI) [PY] 1-6,9-13 * See especially example 1A *;
 [A]EP0413209  (ABBOTT LAB) [A] 1-13 * See claim 1, substituent C *
 [Y]  - LJUNGQVIST A ET AL, "ANTIDE AND RELATED ANTAGONISTS OF LUTEINIZING HORMONE RELEASE WITH LONG ACTION AND ORAL ACTIVITY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (198811), vol. 85, no. 21, pages 8236 - 8240, XP000002834 [Y] 1,6-9,11-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.21.8236
 [Y]  - FLOURET G ET AL, "ANTIOVULATORY ANTAGONISTS OF LHRH RELATED TO ANTIDE", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 89 - 105, XP000653851 [Y] 1-6,9-13 * See especially cmpds 101-103 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/psc.310010202
 [Y]  - HUMPHRIES E.A., "In hibition of the activity of the LHRH by analogues with variations at positions 2,3 and 6 and the carboxyl terminus", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1977), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 967 - 969, XP002070477 [Y] 1-8,10-13 * See especially Table 1, second cmpd *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00217a024
 [Y]  - FOLKERS E.A., "Evolution of design and achievement of inhibitors of the LHRH as inhibitors of ovulation", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR NATURFORSCHUNG, TEIL B: ANORGANISCHE CHEMIE, ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, TUBINGEN DE, (198202), vol. 37b, no. 2, page 247-259, XP002070478 [Y] 1-8,10-13 * See Table I(cmpd 3) and Table IV(cmpd 52 *