Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975886

EP0975886 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH IN AN AUTOMATED MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Transmission Technologies Corporation
23382 Commerce Drive
Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / PATEL, Anand, C.
Apartment 354 5600 West Alexis Road
Sylvania, OH 43560 / US
02 / WHEELER, James, A.
2343 Coe Court
Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US
03 / SZYMANSKI, Peter, T.
1573 Twin Oaks Drive
Toledo, OH 43615 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98918260.515.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US07606
Priority number, dateUS1997084344316.04.1997         Original published format: US 843443
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9846907
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975886
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16D48/06
[2000/17]
Former International [2000/05]F16D48/06, B60K41/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN DER KUPPLUNG IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN MECHANISCHEN GETRIEBE[2000/05]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH IN AN AUTOMATED MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UN EMBRAYAGE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION MECANIQUE AUTOMATISEE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase15.11.1999National basic fee paid 
15.11.1999Search fee paid 
15.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
19.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/22]
30.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4811222  (WATANABE TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0585817  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4986401  (PETZOLD RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4; figures 1-4; claim 9 *;
 [A]EP0423799  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5050714  (KURIHARA KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[XP]US5679099  (KATO SHOGO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4497397  (WINDSOR HARRY M [GB], et al)