Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977777

EP0977777 - A NOVEL TH2-SPECIFIC GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
640 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
MILLENIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
640 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEVINSON, Doug
111 Maple Street
Sherborn, MA 01770 / US
02 / GU, Wei
48 Kilsyth Road 2
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
03 / LEHAR, Sophie
234 Beacon Street 2A
Boston, MA 02116 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Schüssler, Andrea
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Schüssler, Andrea, Dr.
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Application number, filing date98918268.817.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US07616
Priority number, dateUS1997084190117.04.1997         Original published format: US 841901
US1997088407725.06.1997         Original published format: US 884077
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846638
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977777
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, A61K38/17, C07K1/14, A61K39/00, G01N33/574
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:EIN NEUES TH2-SPEZIFISCHES GEN[2000/06]
English:A NOVEL TH2-SPECIFIC GENE[2000/06]
French:NOUVEAU GENE SPECIFIQUE DE TH-2[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999National basic fee paid 
09.11.1999Search fee paid 
09.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
01.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/22]
06.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  - JIANG H ET AL, "SUBTRACTION HYBRIDIZATION IDENTIFIES A NOVEL MELANOMA DIFFERENTIATION ASSOCIATED GENE, MDA-7, MODULATED DURING HUMAN MELANOMA DIFFERENTIATION, GROWTH AND PROGRESSION", ONCOGENE,GB,BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, (19951221), vol. 11, no. 12, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 2477 - 2486, XP002064717 [X] 1-93 * the whole document *
    [] - JIANG H ET AL, "Human MDA-7 mRNA", DATABASE EMBL, (19951231), [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - NATL. CANCER INSTITUTE, "zr92c03.s1 NCI_CGAP_GCB1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:683140 3' mRNA sequence", DATABASE EMBL, (19970203), XP002163905 [X] 7,9,10,12,13 * abstract *
International search[Y]WO9511986  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]);
 [Y]  - WINNACKER E.-L., "FROM GENES TO CLONES.", WINNACKER E.-L., WINNACKER E. L., FROM GENES TO CLONES. INTRODUCTION TO GENE TECHNOLOGY., DE, WEINHEIM, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT., (19870101), pages 198 - 3., 015176, XP002912025