Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977861

EP0977861 - MAMMALIAN CYTOKINE-LIKE FACTOR 7 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZymoGenetics, Inc.
1201 Eastlake Avenue East
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / PRESNELL, Scott, R.
2909 N. Puget Sound Avenue
Tacoma, WA 98407 / US
02 / GILBERT, Teresa
246 12th Street, S.E.
Auburn, WA 98002 / US
03 / WHITMORE, Theodore, E.
6916 152nd Avenue, N.E.
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / FOSTER, Donald, C.
3002 N.E. 181st Street
Seattle, WA 98155 / US
05 / HART, Charles, E.
20114 183rd Place, N.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
06 / LEHNER, Joyce, M.
6522 Phinney Avenue North 201
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
07 / MARTINEZ, Theresa
4591 Honeymoon Bay Road
Greenbank, WA 98253 / US
08 / HOFFMANN, Ross, C.
1271 Pennsylvania Ave.
San Dieo CA 92103 / US
[2000/14]
Former [2000/06]01 / PRESNELL, Scott, R.
919 N. 83rd Street
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
02 / GILBERT, Teresa
246 12th Street, S.E.
Auburn, WA 98002 / US
03 / WHITMORE, Theodore, E.
6916 152nd Avenue, N.E.
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / FOSTER, Donald, C.
3002 N.E. 181st Street
Seattle, WA 98155 / US
05 / HART, Charles, E.
20114 183rd Place, N.E.
Woodinville, WA 98072 / US
06 / LEHNER, Joyce, M.
6522 Phinney Avenue North 201
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
07 / MARTINEZ, Theresa
4591 Honeymoon Bay Road
Greenbank, WA 98253 / US
08 / HOFFMANN, Ross, C.
503 13th Avenue East 302
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
Representative(s)Schlich, George , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Schlich, George William , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98918640.823.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US08212
Priority number, dateUS19970044886P25.04.1997         Original published format: US 44886 P
US1997084575325.04.1997         Original published format: US 845753
US19980071676P16.01.1998         Original published format: US 71676 P
US1998000854316.01.1998         Original published format: US 8543
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849310
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977861
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977861
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/19, C07K14/52, C12N15/62, C07K19/00, C07K16/24, C07K16/42, C12Q1/66, C12Q1/68, G01N33/52, G01N33/60
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:CYTOKINÄHNLICHER FAKTOR-7 AUS SÄUGETIEREN[2000/06]
English:MAMMALIAN CYTOKINE-LIKE FACTOR 7[2000/06]
French:FACTEUR 7 MAMMALIEN DU TYPE CYTOKINE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
20.01.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2004Fee for grant paid
12.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
PT23.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/06]FI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE23.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[XA]  - Database EMBL EMEST10, Entry HS558371, Accession number W74558, 21 June 1996 96% identity with Seq.ID:1 nt.16-408, XP002073847 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 11-19
 [XA]  - Database EMBL EMEST11, Entry HSA33733, Accession number AA033733, 26 August 1996 96% identity with Seq.ID:1 nt.48-501, XP002073848 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 11-19
 [XA]  - Database EMBL EMEST10, Entry HS664361, Accession number W74664, 21 June 1996 98% identity with Seq.ID:1 nt.247-702 reverse orientation, XP002073865 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 11-19
 [XA]  - Database EMBL EMEST16, Entry MMW165, Accession number W91165, 9 July 1996 99% identity with Seq.ID:11 nt.1-389, XP002073849 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 11-19
 [XA]  - Database EMBL EMEST16, Entry MMA44549, Accession number AA044549, 6 September 1996 99% identity with Seq.ID:11 nt.1-498, XP002073850 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 11-19
 [A]  - ZHENG M.H. ET AL., "WHAT'S NEW IN THE ROLE OF CYTOKINES ON OSTEOBLAST PROLIFERATION AND DIFFERENTIATION?", PATHOLOGY RESEARCH AND PRACTICE, (199212), vol. 188, no. 8, pages 1104 - 1121, XP000676745